Historical records matching Bertie Ahern, 11th Taoiseach of Ireland
Immediate Family
-
Privateex-spouse
-
Privatechild
-
Privatechild
-
mother
-
father
-
brother
-
brother
-
Privatesibling
-
Privatesibling
About Bertie Ahern, 11th Taoiseach of Ireland
Bertie Ahern is a former Irish Fianna Fáil politician who served as Taoiseach of Ireland from 26 June 1997 to 7 May 2008.
Ahern served as a Teachta Dála (TD) from 1977 to 2011, representing Dublin Finglas from 1977 to 1981 and Dublin Central from 1981 to 2011. Before he became Taoiseach, he served in the governments of Charles Haughey and Albert Reynolds as Minister for Labour (1987–91) and Minister for Finance (1991–94). He also served briefly as Tánaiste after the break-up of Albert Reynolds' coalition government.
In 1994, Ahern was elected sixth leader of Fianna Fáil. Under Ahern's leadership Fianna Fáil led three coalition governments. After Éamon de Valera, Bertie Ahern's term as Taoiseach is the longest. Ahern resigned as Taoiseach on 6 May 2008, in the wake of revelations made in Mahon Tribunal, and was succeeded by Minister for Finance Brian Cowen. The Mahon Tribunal in 2012 found that Ahern, while not judged corrupt, had received monies from developers and the Tribunal disbelieved his explanations of those payments. Fianna Fáil proposed to expel politicians censured by the tribunal, but Ahern resigned from the party prior to the expulsion motion being moved.
In November 2016, it was announced that a decision had been made by Fianna Fáil to give Ahern the option of rejoining the party.
Bertie Ahern, 11th Taoiseach of Ireland's Timeline
1951 |
September 12, 1951
|
Drumcondra, Dublin, County Dublin, Ireland
|